Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Prohibited Members
Sponsored by
Senators Zirkin and Brochin
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a regulated lobbyist or the spouse of a regulated lobbyist from being appointed as a member of the Baltimore County Board of Education.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/11/2013 2/11/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/13/2013 2/14/2013 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
(   3-109 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page