Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Senators Lam, Lee, Beidle, Elfreth, Feldman, Kagan, Patterson, Pinsky, Rosapepe, Smith, Washington, and Young
Status
Motion Postpone Indefinitely (Senator King) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the aerial application of chlorpyrifos on or after October 1, 2020; prohibiting the use of chlorpyrifos in the State on or after December 31, 2020; establishing the Pesticide Transition Fund to support Maryland farmers in the transition away from the use of chlorpyrifos and to support the work of the Pesticide Transition Task Force, including research on integrated pest management and implementation of the State's plan to transition away from the use of chlorpyrifos; establishing the Pesticide Transition Task Force; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0229
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0270 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {974234/1
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {974234/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/28 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {753825/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (17-27)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {563827/1 (Senator Bailey) Rejected (22-23)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {623226/2 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (18-27)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Motion to Postpone Indefinitely (Senator Bailey) Rejected (15-30)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-14)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
52AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-37)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/07/2020
Legislative Date
5/07/2020
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/15 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/22 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 2/9 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Motion Postpone Indefinitely (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Favorable with Amendments {974234/1 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Favorable with Amendments {974234/1 Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Motion Special Order until 2/28 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Floor Amendment {753825/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (17-27) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Floor Amendment {563827/1 (Senator Bailey) Rejected (22-23) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Floor Amendment {623226/2 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (18-27) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Motion to Postpone Indefinitely (Senator Bailey) Rejected (15-30) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Third Reading Passed (31-14) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Adopted 52AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Second Reading Passed 52AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (94-37) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/07/2020 5/07/2020 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/15 (Senator King) Adopted
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/22 (Senator King) Adopted
Senate 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 2/9 (Senator King) Adopted
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Motion Postpone Indefinitely (Senator King) Adopted
(   5-210.6, 5-210.7 )
Last Updated: 2/9/2021 12:42 PM
Click to return on the top page