Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon License
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Senators
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing in Montgomery County a beauty salon beer and wine license; requiring that a recipient of the license be a holder of a beauty salon permit; authorizing a holder of the license to provide beer and wine by the glass for consumption by a specified customer when a cosmetology service is provided or a fundraising event is held; specifying the hours that the license privilege may be exercised; specifying a $100 annual license fee; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0137
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {704935/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
65
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2014 4/02/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments {704935/1 Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 65
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM