Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Judgments - Appeals - Supersedeas Bond
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Limiting the amount of a supersedeas bond required to stay the enforcement of a judgment in a civil action; authorizing a court to reduce further the amount of a supersedeas bond; providing a procedure by which an appellee may seek discovery for the limited purpose of determining whether an appellant has dissipated or diverted assets under specified circumstances; requiring a circuit court to retain jurisdiction over a specified action for a specified limited purpose; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0164
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {628475/1
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Motion Special Order until later today (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {628475/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2015 2/05/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Favorable with Amendments {628475/1 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Motion Special Order until later today (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Favorable with Amendments {628475/1 Report Adopted 66
Senate 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM