Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Personal Exemptions - Inflation Adjustment
Sponsored by
Senators Eckardt, Bates, Hershey, and Mathias
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the amount of specified exemptions allowed under the State income tax for taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016, by a specified cost-of-living adjustment; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0160
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-211 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM