Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Payments of Public School Construction Costs - Remittance of Reimbursement to County
Sponsored by
Senator Glassman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State, when the State provides reimbursement of forward-funded public school construction or public school capital improvement projects, to remit the funds to the county government for specified payments; and prohibiting the State from remitting a reimbursement to the county board of education.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0087 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM