Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Community College Tuition and Residency Waivers - Funding
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone, Conway, King, Madaleno, McFadden, Middleton, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 12:45 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor, beginning in fiscal year 2020, to include in the annual State budget for the Maryland Higher Education Commission a General Fund appropriation of $7,000,000 to fund State-mandated tuition and residency waivers for community colleges; requiring the Commission to distribute the appropriation to each community college board of trustees based on the number of qualifying students enrolled in each community college in proportion to the total number of enrolled qualifying students, as determined by the Commission; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 12:45 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Higher Education - Community College Tuition and Residency Waivers - Funding
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 12:45 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-320 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM