Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Commission on Health in All Policies
Sponsored by
Senators Nathan-Pulliam, Benson, Currie, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kelley, Lee, Manno, Pugh, Ramirez, Rosapepe, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Commission on Health in All Policies; providing for the purpose, composition, chair, and staffing of the Commission; specifying the duties of the Commission; requiring specified health impact assessments to be performed in a specified manner; requiring the Commission to report to the Governor and General Assembly on December 1 of each year on the findings from and recommendations based on any health impact assessments performed by the Commission; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0423
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/25/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/25/2016 1/25/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/26/2016 1/26/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/26/2016 1/26/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-3401 through 13-3406 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM