Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commonsense Paid Leave Act
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring specified employers to provide employees with specified paid time off; providing that specified employers are eligible for a specified tax subtraction modification under specified circumstances; providing for the method of determining whether an employer is required to provide paid time off; providing for the manner in which paid time off is accrued by the employee and treated by the employer; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0382
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commonsense Paid Leave Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Commonsense Paid Leave Act
Senate 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-106, 3-103, 3-1301 through 3-1306 )
(   10-105.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM