Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Crisis Intervention Team Center of Excellence
Sponsored by
Senators Augustine and Smith
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Crisis Intervention Team Center of Excellence in the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to provide technical support to local governments, law enforcement, public safety agencies, behavioral health agencies, and crisis service providers and to develop and implement a crisis intervention model program; requiring the Office to appoint certain coordinators to the Center; requiring the Center to take certain actions; requiring a certain annual report; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0607
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Crisis Intervention Team Center of Excellence
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Safety - Crisis Intervention Team Center of Excellence
Senate 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/24/2020 1:36 PM