Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Direct Care Workforce Innovation Program
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Direct Care Workforce Innovation Program in the Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning within the Maryland Department of Labor; requiring the Division to provide certain matching grants to certain entities to create and expand on successful recruitment and retention strategies that address certain barriers to increasing the population of direct care workers; requiring the Governor to include a $250,000 appropriation in the annual budget bill for the Program; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0449 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/25/2020
Legislative Date
9/25/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Direct Care Workforce Innovation Program
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/25/2020 9/25/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Senate 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Direct Care Workforce Innovation Program
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/22/2021 2:20 PM
Click to return on the top page