Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Patricia and Arthur Modell Performing Arts Center at the Lyric
Sponsored by
Senator McFadden
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 10:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Bond Bill Fact Sheet
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $350,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Trustees of the Lyric Foundation, Inc. for the design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, and capital equipping of the Patricia and Arthur Modell Performing Arts Center at the Lyric, located in Baltimore City; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0582
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0423 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
NOTE: Bond bills that received funding in fiscal 2014 were amended into the State's Capital budget (HB 101). Individual bond bills were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended HB 101 to specifically list the projects it selected for Bond Funding.
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/09 at 10:00 a.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM