Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Lead Risk Reduction Standards - Maintenance of Exemptions
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the time period when an owner of specified residential rental property is required to submit a specified certification to the Department of the Environment in order to maintain a specified exemption from specified lead-based paint risk reduction standards; requiring an owner of specified residential rental property to submit a specified certification to the Department within a specified time period after receiving a specified written notice in order to maintain a specified exemption; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1158 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2016 1/26/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-804 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM