Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Employment Program (Fostering Employment Act of 2018)
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bates, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Norman, Ready, Reilly, Salling, and Serafini
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Fostering Employment Program to provide employment opportunities for certain foster care recipients and unaccompanied homeless youth through training leading to certain credentials; requiring the Department of Human Services, in coordination with the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, and certain other entities to develop and implement the Program; establishing certain eligibility; defining certain terms; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0431
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {427873/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Employment Program (Fostering Employment Act of 2018)
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {427873/1 Adopted 40
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Employment Program (Fostering Employment Act of 2018)
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 42
House 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Appropriations 43
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/23/2018 3/18/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52A
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 53
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Text - Chapter - Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Employment Program (Fostering Employment Act of 2018)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-101, 4-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM