Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Maryland Community College Promise Scholarship - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
sb309Expanding eligibility for a Maryland Community College Promise Scholarship to an applicant who enrolls in a continuing education course focused on entrepreneurial activates or career development and an individual who is unemployed or laid off through no fault of their own; requiring the Governor to include $3,500,000 in the State budget for fiscal year 2023 in addition to the amount that is already required for Maryland Community College Promise Scholarships; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2020
Legislative Date
11/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2020 11/01/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Higher Education - Maryland Community College Promise Scholarship - Revisions
Last Updated: 1/26/2021 10:23 AM
Click to return on the top page