Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - City of Crisfield
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Creating an exception from motor vehicle registration requirements for golf carts in the City of Crisfield; providing that a person who operates a golf cart on a highway in the City of Crisfield may do so only on specified roads at specified times and only if the golf cart is equipped with specified lighting devices and the operator possesses a valid driver's license; and authorizing the State Highway Administration to develop a location in the City of Crisfield where a person operating a golf cart may cross over a specified highway.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0253
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {700719/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-4)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/27/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/18/2017 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 1/25/2016 1/26/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/25/2016 2/26/2016 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/29/2016 2/29/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 33
Senate 2/29/2016 2/29/2016 Second Reading Passed 33
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 35
House 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation 36
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {700719/1 Report Adopted 56
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-4) 57
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Passed Enrolled 60
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-402, 21-104.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM