Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Small and Minority Business Participation
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Hershey, Norman, and Salling
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 438
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Incorporating specified findings and evidence associated with a specified Minority Business Enterprise Program; requiring that approved applicants for a proposed offshore wind project comply with the Program to a specified extent; clarifying what constitutes good cause for the removal of a certified minority business enterprise after the execution of a contract; altering a requirement that specified units structure procurement procedures to achieve a minimum percentage of the dollar value of contracts for small businesses; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0433
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {816581/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {333526/1 (Delegate Rosenberg) Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (129-6)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Robinson and Waugh)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Robinson and Waugh)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Barron, Platt and Metzgar)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Barron, Platt and Metzgar)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Conference Committee Report {253323/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Conference Committee Report {253323/1 Adopted
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 438
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Finance and Procurement - Small and Minority Business Participation
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable Adopted 43
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed 43
Text - Third - State Finance and Procurement - Small and Minority Business Participation
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 46
House 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {816581/1 Adopted 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Floor Amendment {333526/1 (Delegate Rosenberg) Adopted 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (129-6) 66
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Requests House Recede 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Robinson and Waugh) 62
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 69
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Senate Requests House Recede 69
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Robinson and Waugh) 69
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 House Refuses Recede 69
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Barron, Platt and Metzgar) 69
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 House Refuses Recede 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Barron, Platt and Metzgar) 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Conference Committee Report {253323/1 Adopted 64
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 64
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Conference Committee Report {253323/1 Adopted 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 70
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Finance and Procurement - Small and Minority Business Participation
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 438
Text - Chapter - State Finance and Procurement - Small and Minority Business Participation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-302, 14-501, 14-502 through 14-505 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM