Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
CyberMaryland Act of 2018
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bates, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, Norman, Ready, Reilly, Salling, Serafini, and Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a subtraction modification under the State income tax for certain capital gain income realized on the disposition of an investment in a certain cybersecurity company; authorizing certain buyers of certain technology to claim a credit against the State income tax equal to 50% of certain costs incurred to purchase certain technology; requiring the Secretary of Commerce to approve certain applications for the credits; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0364
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - CyberMaryland Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - CyberMaryland Act of 2018
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-207, 10-733.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM