Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Unpackaged Cigarettes - Prohibition on Sale
Sponsored by
Senators Hayes, Carter, Ferguson, McCray, and Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 314
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a certain person from selling an unpackaged cigarette; authorizing an enforcement officer of the Tobacco Use Prevention and Cessation Program in the Baltimore City Health Department to enforce the Act in a certain manner; requiring an enforcement officer to report a violation of the Act to a State's Attorney; and providing that issuance of a citation for violation of a certain provision of law precludes prosecution under the Act for a violation arising out of the same incident.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1351
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Unpackaged Cigarettes - Prohibition on Sale
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Unpackaged Cigarettes - Prohibition on Sale
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted (120-10)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 314
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Unpackaged Cigarettes - Prohibition on Sale
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Baltimore City - Unpackaged Cigarettes - Prohibition on Sale
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable Adopted 39
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Second Reading Passed 39
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Unpackaged Cigarettes - Prohibition on Sale
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Economic Matters 43
House 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted (120-10) 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 68
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 314
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Unpackaged Cigarettes - Prohibition on Sale
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM