Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Promoting Efficiencies in State Procurement
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Hershey and Salling
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 588
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering provisions of State procurement law; altering the dollar value threshold that triggers the requirement to publish notice in eMaryland Marketplace; specifying a preferred procurement method for human, social, cultural, or educational services; establishing qualification based selection as the method of procurement for specified procurements; clarifying the authority of the board of trustees of a community college to advertise specified bids on eMaryland Marketplace; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0426
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Promoting Efficiencies in State Procurement
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {754336/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Promoting Efficiencies in State Procurement
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 588
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Promoting Efficiencies in State Procurement
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Promoting Efficiencies in State Procurement
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable with Amendments {754336/1 Adopted 52
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Text - Third - Promoting Efficiencies in State Procurement
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 57
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 66
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 588
Text - Chapter - Promoting Efficiencies in State Procurement
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-311, 16-313 )
(   11-203, 13-101, 13-102, 13-103, 13-104, 13-109, 13-112, 13-114, 13-301 through 13-323, 13-401, 13-402, 15-202, 17-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM