Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's License Fees - Alteration
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bates, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Norman, Ready, Reilly, Salling, Serafini, and Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the time to pay certain manufacturer's license fees from annually to one time; altering the amount of certain manufacturer's license fees; providing that prorating of certain fees for certain licenses does not apply to a license for which there is no annual fee; and providing that a manufacturer's license does not expire on a certain date after its issuance.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0357
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's License Fees - Alteration
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's License Fees - Alteration
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 2-202, 2-203, 2-204, 2-205, 2-206, 2-207, 2-208, 2-209, 2-210, 3-109, 3-202, 3-204, 3-401 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM