Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Provisional Drivers' Licenses - First Aid and Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation (CPR) Training Requirement
Sponsored by
Senator Astle
Status
In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an applicant for a provisional driver's license to complete successfully, within 1 year of application, a first aid and cardiopulmonary resuscitation training course that meets specified standards; requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to develop and make available a list of specified organizations; requiring the Administration to prescribe a specified form; requiring the Administration to provide a specified notice; requiring the Administration to adopt specified regulations; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Hearing cancelled
(   16-111, 16-111.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page