Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Anne Arundel County Deputy Sheriff
Sponsored by
Senator Astle
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a specified definition of "public safety employee" to include Anne Arundel County deputy sheriffs for purposes of establishing eligibility for enhanced workers' compensation benefits for a permanent partial disability award for less than a specified number of weeks; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0370
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/05/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-1)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2013 2/05/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/04/2013 3/04/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 38
Senate 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Second Reading Passed 38
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 40
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters 43
House 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (128-1) 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-628, 9-629 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM