Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Board of Revenue Estimates and Bureau of Revenue Estimates - Organization and Operations
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Comptroller to appoint the Chief of the Bureau of Revenue Estimates from a list of candidates reviewed and evaluated by the Consensus Revenue Monitoring and Forecasting Group; requiring the Bureau to submit the March revenue report to the Board of Revenue Estimates by a date that allows the Board to meet prior to the passage of the annual budget bill in the first chamber of the General Assembly to vote on the budget bill in that year; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0113
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/27/2020
Legislative Date
10/27/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2021
Legislative Date
1/11/2021
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/27/2020 10/27/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Board of Revenue Estimates and Bureau of Revenue Estimates - Organization and Operations
Senate 1/11/2021 1/11/2021 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/12/2021 12:28 PM