Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County Board of Education – Vacancies
Sponsored by
Senators Hough and Young
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the method for filling a vacancy on the Frederick County Board of Education; specifying that an individual appointed to fill a vacancy serves for the remainder of a certain term and until a successor is appointed and qualifies except that under certain circumstances the individual serves only until a successor is elected at the next general election; specifying how certain positions are to be filled at a general election; establishing the manner for nominating candidates for vacated offices; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0410
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Frederick County Board of Education – Vacancies
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Frederick County Board of Education – Vacancies
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Frederick County Board of Education – Vacancies
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Favorable Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Second Reading Passed 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Frederick County Board of Education – Vacancies
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2020 3/05/2020 Referred Ways and Means 42AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
(   3-5B-01 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:59 PM
Click to return on the top page