Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bates, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Mathias, McFadden, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, Waugh, Kasemeyer, Madaleno, Currie, DeGrange, Ferguson, Guzzone, King, Peters, Klausmeier, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to appropriate at least $1,000,000 each fiscal year for the Partnership for Workforce Quality Program; establishing the More Jobs for Marylanders Program in the Department of Commerce to provide manufacturing business entities tax credits and benefits for up to 10 consecutive benefit years; requiring the Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning to partner with specified State departments to identify opportunities to create apprenticeship programs; allowing a tax credit for employing an apprentice; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0394
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017, July 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {549137/1
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {549137/1 (Budget and Taxation Committee) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {739336/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {863526/1 (Senator Manno) Rejected (8-34)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {795566/1
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Committee Amendment Withdrawn
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Substitute Committee Amendment {685065/2 Adopted
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Walker) Adopted (133-0)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable with Amendments {549137/1 51
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Motion Laid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted 51
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable with Amendments {549137/1 (Budget and Taxation Committee) Adopted 53
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Floor Committee Amendment {739336/1 Adopted 53
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Floor Amendment {863526/1 (Senator Manno) Rejected (8-34) 53
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
Text - Third - More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 54
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 60
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments {795566/1 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Committee Amendment Withdrawn 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Substitute Committee Amendment {685065/2 Adopted 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Walker) Adopted (133-0) 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 70
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 64
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 64
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
Text - Chapter - More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 3-402, 3-411, 6-101, 6-801 through 6-809 )
(   18-101, 18-3301 through 18-3304, 21-204 )
(   11-102, 11-103 )
(   10-210.1, 10-741, 10-742, 11-411, 1-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM