Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education Degree and Job Certification Without Debt Act of 2018
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Kasemeyer, Conway, Madaleno, Astle, Benson, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Peters, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to include $500,000 in fiscal year 2020 and $750,000 in each of fiscal years 2021 through 2024 in the State budget to the Higher Education Commission for near completer grants for certain recipients; requiring that grants are to be provided on a first-come, first-served basis and may be used only for tuition; establishing the Maryland Community College Promise Program to provide an opportunity for community college students to earn an associate degree or a certificate debt-free; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0951
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Higher Education Degree and Job Certification Without Debt Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 12:45 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {944238/1
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {944238/1 Adopted (33-13)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {183820/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (15-30)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {163922/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (16-30)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Higher Education Degree and Job Certification Without Debt Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-13)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means Appropriations
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
4/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {375063/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (91-44)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Kagan and Waugh)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Kagan and Waugh)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Luedtke, Ebersole and Patterson)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Luedtke, Ebersole and Patterson)
Proceedings
67
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Text - First - Higher Education Degree and Job Certification Without Debt Act of 2018
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 12:45 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {944238/1 45
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted 45
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {944238/1 Adopted (33-13) 46
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Floor Amendment {183820/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (15-30) 46
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Floor Amendment {163922/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (16-30) 46
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Higher Education Degree and Job Certification Without Debt Act of 2018
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Third Reading Passed (31-13) 48
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Referred Ways and Means Appropriations 47
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments {375063/1 Adopted 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (91-44) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Requests House Recede 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Kagan and Waugh) 66
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 69
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Requests House Recede 69
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Kagan and Waugh) 69
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 House Refuses Recede 69
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Luedtke, Ebersole and Patterson) 69
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 House Refuses Recede 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Luedtke, Ebersole and Patterson) 67
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-209, 16-317, 16-514, 16-701 through 16-707 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM