Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Mental Health Services - Telemental Health Services - Psychiatric Nurse Practitioners
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Astle, Benson, Eckardt, Feldman, Kelley, Middleton, and Peters
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring that regulations adopted by the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene under a specified provision of law allow psychiatric nurse practitioners to provide and receive reimbursement from State and federal funds for telemental health services.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1026
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2015 2/05/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/27/2015 3/02/2015 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM