Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cybersecurity Investment Incentive Tax Credit - Eligibility and Sunset Extension
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bates, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Ferguson, Hough, Manno, Mathias, Norman, Ready, Rosapepe, Salling, and Serafini
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the eligibility criteria under the cybersecurity investment incentive tax credit to provide the credit to a specified qualified investor in a specified qualified Maryland cybersecurity company rather than providing the credit to the company; altering the definition of "company" to include an entity that becomes duly organized and existing under specified laws and for the purpose of conducting business for profit within a specified time period; and extending the termination date of the credit.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0378
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {589234/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Cybersecurity Investment Incentive Tax Credit - Eligibility and Sunset Extension
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {589234/1 Adopted 43
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Text - Third - Cybersecurity Investment Incentive Tax Credit - Eligibility and Sunset Extension
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Referred Ways and Means 47
House 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-733 )
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:43 PM