Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Lottery - Licensed Agents - Commissions
Sponsored by
Senator DeGrange
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the commissions from 5.5% to 6% that specified licensed agents receive from specified lottery ticket sales.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2016 1/27/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 29
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Second Reading Passed 29
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 31
House 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 33
House 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page