Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Nursing - Electrology Practice Committee - Membership
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the Electrology Practice Committee within the State Board of Nursing; and providing for the elimination of the positions of specified members of the Committee.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0251
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
17A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
17A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
19
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/20/2014 1/20/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 17A
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 Second Reading Passed 17A
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 19
House 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations 22
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/24/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/25/2014 3/20/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 56
House 3/25/2014 3/20/2014 Second Reading Passed 56
House 3/26/2014 3/21/2014 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 57
Senate 3/27/2014 3/20/2014 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM