Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Student Debt Relief Act of 2017
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bates, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Norman, Ready, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, and Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a subtraction modification under the State income tax for the amount of interest paid by a qualified taxpayer on qualified student loans; requiring the Comptroller to adopt specified regulations; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0399
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Student Debt Relief Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Student Debt Relief Act of 2017
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-208 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:35 AM