Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sexual Offenders - Lifetime Supervision
Sponsored by
Senators Bailey and Ready
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a sentence for certain persons convicted of certain sexual abuse crimes involving a child over the age of 12 years to include a term of lifetime sexual offender supervision; and providing for the prospective application of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1116
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Sexual Offenders - Lifetime Supervision
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Sexual Offenders - Lifetime Supervision
Senate 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/12/2020 10:30 AM