Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Foreign Corporations - Resident Agents - State Department of Assessments and Taxation
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Assessments and Taxation)
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a foreign corporation to certify that the State Department of Assessments and Taxation is the corporation's resident agent when registering or qualifying with the Department; and authorizing the Department to act as a resident agent for a foreign corporation that does business in the State without a resident agent or with a resident agent who cannot be found or served with the exercise of reasonable diligence.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0891 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/23/2020
Legislative Date
9/23/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2021
Legislative Date
1/04/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2021
Legislative Date
1/04/2021
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 11:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 9/23/2020 9/23/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Foreign Corporations - Resident Agents - State Department of Assessments and Taxation
Senate 1/04/2021 1/04/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/04/2021 1/04/2021 Hearing 1/14 at 11:30 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Favorable Adopted 5 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Second Reading Passed 5 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Foreign Corporations - Resident Agents - State Department of Assessments and Taxation
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/26/2021 3:33 PM
Click to return on the top page