Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Police Behavioral Health Units - Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Senators Nathan-Pulliam and Ferguson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, on or before October 1, 2016, the Baltimore City and Baltimore County police departments to establish behavioral health units; requiring a behavioral health unit to consist of at least six officers who are specially trained to understand the needs of individuals with mental health, substance use, or co-occurring mental health and substance use disorders and in cultural sensitivity and cultural competency; establishing the purpose and goals of a behavioral health unit; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0926
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {997470/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2015 2/05/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments {997470/1 Report Adopted 39
Senate 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Senate 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary 43
House 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 66
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM