Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Nuisance Organisms - Reward for Information
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton and King
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to award a reward to a person providing information leading to a conviction for a violation of specified nuisance organism laws or regulations; requiring a specified reward to be paid from specified fine proceeds in an amount not to exceed a specified percentage of fines imposed; and prohibiting a reward from being awarded to a law enforcement officer or an employee of the Department.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0914
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {764534/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2015 3/12/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments {764534/1 Report Adopted 42
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation 44
House 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM