Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health – Health and Wellness Standards – Correctional Facilities and Health Care Facilities
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Health to adopt certain health and wellness standards for certain health care facilities; providing that certain standards may exceed the standards set by federal law; establishing the Correctional Facilities Health and Wellness Pilot Program to establish minimum mandatory standards for inmate food services for participating correctional facilities; requiring each participating facility to comply with certain health and wellness standards, offer plant-based meals, and provide certain information to inmates; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/27/2020
Legislative Date
10/27/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2021
Legislative Date
1/11/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/27/2020 10/27/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health – Health and Wellness Standards – Correctional Facilities and Health Care Facilities
Senate 1/11/2021 1/11/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
(   19-308,   21-1301, 21-1302 )
Last Updated: 1/20/2021 3:57 PM
Click to return on the top page