Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act - Reauthorization
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Raskin, Benson, Brochin, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pugh, Ramirez, Rosapepe, Young, and Zirkin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 11
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the termination date for a provision of law requiring the State to reduce statewide greenhouse gas emissions by 25% from 2006 levels by 2020; requiring the State to reduce statewide greenhouse gas emissions by 40% from 2006 levels by 2030; requiring the Department of the Environment to submit specified plans to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before specified dates; requiring the Maryland Commission on Climate Change to oversee a study of the economic impact of requiring specified reductions from the manufacturing sector; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0610
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {824630/1
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {824630/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {823122/1
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Special Order until 2/18 (Senator Waugh) Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {823122/1 Rejected (13-34)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (38-8)
Proceedings
29
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-39)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 11
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2016 1/27/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2016 2/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments {824630/1 24
Senate 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 24
Senate 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments {824630/1 Report Adopted 25
Senate 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {823122/1 25
Senate 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Special Order until 2/18 (Senator Waugh) Adopted 25
Senate 2/18/2016 2/18/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {823122/1 Rejected (13-34) 26
Senate 2/18/2016 2/18/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Third Reading Passed (38-8) 29
House 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 First Reading Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation 31
House 3/28/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 56
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed 56
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (97-39) 57
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 11
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-1204, 2-1204.1, 2-1205, 2-1206, 2-1207, 2-1210, 2-1211 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM