Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2016
Sponsored by
Senators Miller, Astle, Benson, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Feldman, Ferguson, Gladden, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Young, and Zirkin
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 13
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that in specified fiscal years specified amounts be provided to the University of Maryland Medical System Corporation to support the transition of the Prince George's County Regional Medical Center to operation as a participating institution of the University of Maryland Medical Corporation; requiring that State and Prince George's County funds be used only to increase access to critical health care services and to improve the quality of the services provided; making the Act subject to specified contingencies; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0309
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 3 of this Act
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {109435/1
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {109435/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/2 (Senator Peters) Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/4 (Senator Waugh) Rejected (14-32)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-9)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {204261/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (92-45)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-9)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 13
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2016 1/27/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/22/2016 2/22/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable with Amendments {109435/1 29
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 29
Senate 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {109435/1 Report Adopted 30
Senate 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Senate 2/29/2016 2/29/2016 Special Order until 3/2 (Senator Peters) Adopted 33
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Motion Special Order until 3/4 (Senator Waugh) Rejected (14-32) 35
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Third Reading Passed (36-9) 35
House 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 First Reading Appropriations 37
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2016 3/19/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments {204261/1 Report Adopted 49
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (92-45) 50
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 51
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Third Reading Passed (36-9) 51
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Passed Enrolled 51
Post Passage 4/07/2016 4/05/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 13
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM