Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Serving Underage Individuals - Penalties
Sponsored by
Washington County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing in Washington County a certain requirement necessary to establish a defense against selling or providing alcoholic beverages to an individual under the age of 21 years, altering certain penalties; making it a misdemeanor under certain circumstances to sell or provide alcoholic beverages to an individual under the age of 21 years; and prohibiting the Washington County Board of License Commissioners from proceeding administratively against a certain license holder until after a certain event occurs.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1202
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {974136/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Serving Underage Individuals - Penalties
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {974136/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 47
Text - Third - Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Serving Underage Individuals - Penalties
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Referred Economic Matters 46
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 56
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Text - Chapter - Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Serving Underage Individuals - Penalties
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   31-102, 31-2702, 6-304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM