Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Basket of Cheer
Sponsored by
Senators Young and Hough
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 656
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Establishing a basket of cheer permit in Frederick County; requiring the Board of License Commissioners to grant the permit at no cost to holders of certain Class C per diem licenses; providing that the permit authorizes the permit holder to provide as a prize at a benefit performance not more than 10 baskets of cheer of alcoholic beverages produced in Maryland and obtained from the holder of a retail license; and stating that the alcoholic beverages in a basket of cheer shall be for off-premises consumption.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0447
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Basket of Cheer
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Basket of Cheer
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 656
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Basket of Cheer
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Basket of Cheer
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40
Text - Third - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Basket of Cheer
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 42
House 3/11/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Economic Matters 43A
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 656
Text - Chapter - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Basket of Cheer
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-102, 20-1317 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM