Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tax Sales – Redemption – Nondelinquent Taxes
Sponsored by
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Assessments and Taxation)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the amount which a person is required to pay the tax collector to redeem property sold at tax sale by limiting taxes, interest, and penalties accruing after the sale to include only delinquent taxes, interest, and penalties; and requiring that certain notices include certain information regarding the taxes included in a redemption payment.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/23/2020
Legislative Date
9/23/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Tax Sales – Redemption – Nondelinquent Taxes
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2021
Legislative Date
1/11/2021
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/23/2020 9/23/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Tax Sales – Redemption – Nondelinquent Taxes
Senate 1/11/2021 1/11/2021 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/26/2021 2:11 PM
Click to return on the top page