Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Municipal Elections - Certificates of Candidacy - Proof of Filing
Sponsored by
Senators Currie, Astle, Benson, Kelley, King, Nathan-Pulliam, Norman, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a municipality to provide an individual who is filing a certificate of candidacy to become a candidate in a municipal election with proof of the time and date the certificate was filed.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2016 1/27/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM