Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Financial Aid - Reduction Restrictions
Sponsored by
Senators Young, Klausmeier, Eckardt, Guzzone, Muse, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing financial aid awarded by a public senior higher education institution to be reduced only under specified circumstances; authorizing financial aid awarded by a public senior higher education institution to be reduced up to a specified amount under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0266
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {464432/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-2)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Financial Aid - Reduction Restrictions
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments {464432/1 Adopted 42
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Text - Third - Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Financial Aid - Reduction Restrictions
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Referred Appropriations 46
House 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-2) 63
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331
Text - Chapter - Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Financial Aid - Reduction Restrictions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-121 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM