Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Landlord and Tenant - Procedures for Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing a landlord in Anne Arundel County to repossess property in a certain manner for failure of a tenant to pay rent if a judgment is entered in favor of the landlord; requiring the landlord to provide a written notice of an intended repossession to a tenant in a certain manner; requiring a sheriff in certain circumstances to notify the District Court and prohibiting the sheriff from executing the warrant of restitution without further order of the Court; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/25/2020
Legislative Date
9/25/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 9/25/2020 9/25/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Landlord and Tenant - Procedures for Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/12/2021 12:29 PM