Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Highways - Dedication - Henrietta Lacks Way
Sponsored by
Senators Nathan-Pulliam, Salling, Benson, Conway, Currie, Eckardt, Edwards, Ferguson, Kagan, Kelley, King, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, Young, Zucker, and Oaks
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 555
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Highway Administration to dedicate a specified portion of Maryland Route 695A in Baltimore County as Henrietta Lacks Way.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): August 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Highways - Dedication - Henrietta Lacks Way
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {137372/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Highways - Dedication - Henrietta Lacks Way
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {330214/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - State Highways - Dedication - Henrietta Lacks Way
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 555
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Highways - Dedication - Henrietta Lacks Way
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - State Highways - Dedication - Henrietta Lacks Way
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments {137372/1 Adopted 42
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Text - Third - State Highways - Dedication - Henrietta Lacks Way
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 46
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {330214/1 Adopted 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 65
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Highways - Dedication - Henrietta Lacks Way
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 555
Text - Chapter - State Highways - Dedication - Henrietta Lacks Way
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM