Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Benson, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Forehand, Frosh, Gladden, King, Madaleno, Manno, Montgomery, Muse, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Rosapepe, Stone, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Finance)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying the State minimum wage rate that is in effect for specified time periods; increasing, except under specified circumstances, the State minimum wage rate in effect for specified time periods based on the annual growth in the Consumer Price Index; requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry, beginning on a specified date and each subsequent year, to determine and announce the growth in the Consumer Price Index, if any, and the new State minimum wage rate; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0295
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Senate 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Finance)
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
1/21/2014 Text - First - Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-403, 3-413, 3-415, 3-419, 3-420, 3-427 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM