Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - School Construction Master Plan Workgroup
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Prince George's County School Construction Master Plan Workgroup; requiring the Workgroup to make recommendations based on its review of the FY2017 Educational Facilities Master Plan; requiring the Workgroup to report its findings by December 31, 2018, to the Prince George's County Executive, the Prince George's County Council, the Prince George's County Board of Education, the Interagency Committee on School Construction, and the Prince George's County House and Senate Delegations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1438
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Prince George's County - School Construction Master Plan Workgroup
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Reassigned to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
13
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Prince George's County - School Construction Master Plan Workgroup
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Hearing 4/09 at 3:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Prince George's County - School Construction Master Plan Workgroup
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Prince George's County - School Construction Master Plan Workgroup
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Reassigned to Budget and Taxation 13
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Adopted 57
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Second Reading Passed 57
Text - Third - Prince George's County - School Construction Master Plan Workgroup
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 58
House 4/02/2018 3/24/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 58
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Hearing 4/09 at 3:45 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 68
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 69
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416
Text - Chapter - Prince George's County - School Construction Master Plan Workgroup
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM