Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Calvert County - Improvements to County Roads and Related Infrastructure - "Quick-Take" Condemnation
Sponsored by
Senator Miller
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Proposing an addition to the Maryland Constitution to authorize the General Assembly to provide that specified property located in Calvert County may be taken by the County Commissioners of Calvert County for public use immediately on payment of a specified amount to the owner of the property, under specified circumstances and subject to specified conditions; establishing a specified "quick-take" procedure for the acquisition of property by the County Commissioners of Calvert County for specified purposes; etc.
Committees
Details
Constitutional Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on enactment of a constitutional amendment and on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/20/2015 2/23/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM