Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Voting - Ballot Request and Canvassing Procedures
Sponsored by
Senators Simonaire, Zucker, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Peters, and Bates
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering certain requirements for canvassing provisional ballots when an individual casts more than one ballot for the same election; requiring a local board of elections to review all documents relating to an individual to verify certain ballots if certain ballots are cast in the name of the same individual in the same election; requiring a local board of elections to count a verified ballot and reject an unverified ballot if the local board determines that only one of the ballots was cast by the voter; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018, July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Voting - Ballot Request and Canvassing Procedures
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {114839/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {323323/1 (Senator Bates) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Election Law - Voting - Ballot Request and Canvassing Procedures
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {785565/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
70
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Election Law - Voting - Ballot Request and Canvassing Procedures
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {114839/1 Adopted 40
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Floor Amendment {323323/1 (Senator Bates) Adopted 40
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Election Law - Voting - Ballot Request and Canvassing Procedures
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 42
House 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Ways and Means 43
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments {785565/1 Adopted 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 70
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-303, 9-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM